ND HB1057 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 37-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to department of veterans' affairs employees; to amend and reenact section 37-14-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county veterans' service officers; to provide for reports to the legislative council; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 37-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to department of veterans' affairs employees; to amend and reenact section 37-14-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county veterans' service officers; to provide for reports to the legislative council; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 039 nays 008 | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 087 nays 005 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Dever Cook Horne | |
2009-04-13 | Conf comm appointed Kasper Nathe Amerman | |
2009-04-13 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 039 nays 007 | |
2009-03-20 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 001 | |
2009-03-20 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-03-17 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-17 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 088 nays 005 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 022 n 000 | |
2009-02-13 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-13 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 004 | |
2009-02-05 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1057.html |