ND HB1192 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 26.1-01-07 and a new section to chapter 26.1-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees charged for insurance producer license continuation; to amend and reenact sections 26.1-26-20, 26.1-26-31, 26.1-26-31.1, and 26.1-26-50 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance producer continuing education requirements and penalties; to repeal sections 26.1-26-31.4 and 26.1-26-31.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance producer continuing education requirements; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 26.1-01-07 and a new section to chapter 26.1-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees charged for insurance producer license continuation; to amend and reenact sections 26.1-26-20, 26.1-26-31, 26.1-26-31.1, and 26.1-26-50 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance producer continuing education requirements and penalties; to repeal sections 26.1-26-31.4 and 26.1-26-31.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance producer continuing education requirements; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-12 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 014 n 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 03:15 | |
2009-03-03 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-26 | Received from House | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 085 nays 004 | |
2009-01-22 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1192.html |