ND HB1385 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Nething A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 50-24.6-02 and 50-24.6-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the drug use review board and the prior authorization program.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Nething A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 50-24.6-02 and 50-24.6-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the drug use review board and the prior authorization program.
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson [?] | Rep. Chet Pollert [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-04-30 | Concurred | |
2009-04-03 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-03 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 028 nays 017 | |
2009-04-03 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back amended, without recommendation y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-01-27 | Received from House | |
2009-01-26 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1385.html |