ND HB1419 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Fischer A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 54-27.2-01 and 54-27.2-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the maximum balance of and transfers to the budget stabilization fund; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Fischer A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 54-27.2-01 and 54-27.2-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the maximum balance of and transfers to the budget stabilization fund; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-10 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 003 nays 043 | |
2009-04-06 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 002 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading passed, y 083 n 010 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 010 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1419.html |