ND HB1540 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Warner A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 50-01.2-03.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the funding of economic assistance programs in counties with federally recognized Indian reservation land; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Warner A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 50-01.2-03.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the funding of economic assistance programs in counties with federally recognized Indian reservation land; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading, passed, yeas 072 nays 019 | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed J. Lee Dever Marcellais | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Hofstad Damschen Conklin | |
2009-04-17 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 003 | |
2009-03-23 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-03-19 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-19 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 001 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 022 n 002 | |
2009-02-09 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1540.html |