ND SB2040 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new subsections to section 57-39.2-01 and a new section to chapter 57-39.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of telecommunications company and telecommunications service and to a sales and use tax exemption for equipment used in telecommunications infrastructure development; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new subsections to section 57-39.2-01 and a new section to chapter 57-39.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of telecommunications company and telecommunications service and to a sales and use tax exemption for equipment used in telecommunications infrastructure development; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-17 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed, yeas 038 nays 009 | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-04-01 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 088 nays 000 | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 021 n 001 | |
2009-03-18 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 003 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 027 nays 018 | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back without recommendation y 012 n 002 | |
2009-02-13 | Committee Hearing 03:00 | |
2009-02-09 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2040.html |