ND SB2160 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 13-04.1 and chapter 13-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensing of residential mortgage brokers and regulation of loans not in excess of one thousand dollars and automatic extension of money broker license; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 6-01-01.1, sections 13-04.1-02.1, 13-04.1-04, and 13-04.1-05, subsection 2 of section 41-09-11, and section 51-14-03.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to changes necessitated by the repeal of chapter 13-03.1, exemptions from licensing requirements under the North Dakota money broker statute, annual license fees, and licensure renewal dates; to repeal chapter 13-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation of lending activities; to provide a penalty; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new sections to chapter 13-04.1 and chapter 13-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensing of residential mortgage brokers and regulation of loans not in excess of one thousand dollars and automatic extension of money broker license; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 6-01-01.1, sections 13-04.1-02.1, 13-04.1-04, and 13-04.1-05, subsection 2 of section 41-09-11, and section 51-14-03.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to changes necessitated by the repeal of chapter 13-03.1, exemptions from licensing requirements under the North Dakota money broker statute, annual license fees, and licensure renewal dates; to repeal chapter 13-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation of lending activities; to provide a penalty; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-02 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading passed, y 085 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-03-18 | Request return from committee | |
2009-03-18 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-03-12 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-11 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-17 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-02-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-02-12 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-06 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2160.html |