ND SB2227 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Boucher, Carlson (At the request of the Governor) A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsections 5 and 6 of section 43-12.2-01 and subsection 3 of section 43-12.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the medical loan repayment program; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Boucher, Carlson (At the request of the Governor) A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsections 5 and 6 of section 43-12.2-01 and subsection 3 of section 43-12.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the medical loan repayment program; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 000 | |
2009-04-17 | Concurred | |
2009-04-15 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 089 nays 003 | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-10 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 022 n 001 | |
2009-03-18 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-03-10 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-05 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-04 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-02-03 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-03 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-28 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2227.html |