ND SB2231 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. N. Johnson, Hofstad, Kerzman A BILL for an Act to provide for contracting with a statewide charitable food recovery and distribution organization; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
Introduced by Rep. N. Johnson, Hofstad, Kerzman A BILL for an Act to provide for contracting with a statewide charitable food recovery and distribution organization; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-02 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Second reading, passed, yeas 054 nays 037 | |
2009-03-24 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 016 n 008 | |
2009-03-13 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-02-16 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 034 nays 012 | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 005 | |
2009-02-04 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-01-29 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2231.html |