ND SB2256 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Kasper, Nelson, Nottestad A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 32-12.2-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to contracts between the state and a political subdivision; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Kasper, Nelson, Nottestad A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 32-12.2-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to contracts between the state and a political subdivision; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Fischer [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Second reading passed, y 046 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-16 | Concurred | |
2009-04-02 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-02 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-02 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-03-25 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-24 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 011 n 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-02-04 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-01-30 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-29 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2256.html |