NE LB113 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a co-payment for correctional inmates' health care services
Title
Provide a co-payment for correctional inmates' health care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Larson MO161 approved |
2016-01-19 | Legislature | Larson MO161 Unanimous consent to bracket until April 20, 2016 filed |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO160 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO159 Bracket filed |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO158 pending |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO158 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO157 failed |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO157 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO156 failed |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO156 pending |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO156 Reconsider the vote to recommit to committee filed |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO155 failed |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO155 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed |
2016-01-14 | Legislature | Judiciary AM508 pending |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Larson priority bill |
2015-03-03 | Legislature | Judiciary AM508 filed |
2015-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM508 |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |