NE LB44 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change criminal penalty and parole provisions relating to offenses committed by persons under eighteen years of age
Title
Change criminal penalty and parole provisions relating to offenses committed by persons under eighteen years of age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 08, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Hadley explanation of vote |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 02, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 38-1-10 |
2013-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Ashford FA67 withdrawn |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Ashford FA67 filed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Harr AM1094 withdrawn |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Harr AM1094 filed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1087 adopted |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Schumacher AM1087 filed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | McCoy AM983 withdrawn |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | McCoy AM981 withdrawn |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER60 adopted |
2013-04-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER60 filed |
2013-04-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER60 |
2013-04-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-11 | Legislature | Chambers MO42 withdrawn |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM983 filed |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM981 filed |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Chambers MO42 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Judiciary AM151 adopted |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA56 withdrawn |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA56 filed |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Carlson FA55 adopted |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Carlson FA55 filed |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh MO41 withdrawn |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh MO41 pending |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh MO41 Bracket until June 5, 2013 filed |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Judiciary AM151 pending |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM967 lost |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM967 pending |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM967 filed |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | McCoy AM951 withdrawn |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Schumacher AM950 withdrawn |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | McCoy AM951 filed |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Schumacher AM950 pending |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Schumacher AM950 filed |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA53 lost |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA54 lost |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA53 filed |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA54 filed |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM874 divided |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Judiciary AM151 pending |
2013-04-05 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM874 filed |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Judiciary priority bill |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | Judiciary AM151 filed |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM151 |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Chambers name added |
2013-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2013 |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |