NE LB67 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-10 - Approved by Governor on February 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-10 - Approved by Governor on February 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify required use and enforcement provisions regarding seat belts and other occupant protection systems
Title
Clarify required use and enforcement provisions regarding seat belts and other occupant protection systems
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | Approved by Governor on February 10, 2011 | |
2011-02-04 | Cook explanation of vote | |
2011-02-04 | Presented to Governor on February 04, 2011 | |
2011-02-04 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-02-04 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | |
2011-02-01 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-01-31 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-01-24 | Placed on Select File | |
2011-01-21 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-01-19 | Placed on General File | |
2011-01-11 | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2011 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Date of introduction |