NE LB801 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent to transfer money to the Middle Income Workforce Housing Investment Fund and the Affordable Housing Trust Fund
Title
State intent to transfer money to the Middle Income Workforce Housing Investment Fund and the Affordable Housing Trust Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB801 amended into LB814 by AM915 |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 08, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |