NH CACR15 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to legal actions. Providing that taxpayers have standing to bring actions against the government.
Title
Relating to legal actions. Providing that taxpayers have standing to bring actions against the government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - OTP (Y: 309 N: 9 NV: 42 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - OTP (Y: 309 N: 9 NV: 42 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Reconsider the vote on Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | The Chair rescinded OT3rdg, 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Rules and Enrolled Bills; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 309-9 By Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 94 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 43 |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 25 |