NH HB1105 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to application of a local tax cap.
Title
Relative to application of a local tax cap.
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Pauer [R] | Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] | Rep. Jacob Brouillard [R] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] |
Rep. Tom Mannion [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. John Lewicke [R] | Rep. Richard Brown [R] |
Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0212h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0212h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0212h 01/24/2024 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government |