NH HB1137 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0170; Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0170; Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annulment of certain obstruction of justice crimes and relative to the crime of escape.
Title
Relative to annulment of certain obstruction of justice crimes and relative to the crime of escape.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0170; Effective date 1/1/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1348s (Rep. Pantelakos) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1348s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1348s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1348s, 4/24/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 3/25/14, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 19 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |