NH HB1138 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0171; Effective date 9/9/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0171; Effective date 9/9/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to homestead food producers selling food products at farm stands, farmers markets, or at the homestead residence where they are produced.
Title
Relative to homestead food producers selling food products at farm stands, farmers markets, or at the homestead residence where they are produced.
Sponsors
Rep. Guy Comtois [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. Stephen Palmer [R] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
Rep. Warren Groen [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0171; Effective date 9/9/2014. |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/8/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Hearing: 4/29/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture |