NH HB1182 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Senate Sen. Stiles Moved Remove HB 1182 From Table, Div. 12Y-12N, Motion Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Senate Sen. Stiles Moved Remove HB 1182 From Table, Div. 12Y-12N, Motion Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the sale of baby food products containing bisphenol A in New Hampshire.
Title
Prohibiting the sale of baby food products containing bisphenol A in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - OTP (REP B.MURPHY) (Y: 166 N: 125 NV: 53 Abs: 53) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. Stiles Moved Remove HB 1182 From Table, Div. 12Y-12N, Motion Failed | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.478 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Ought to Pass Not Voted On | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 13, Pg.478 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.478 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Sen. White Withdrew Motion to Lay on Table; Senate Journal 13, Pg.478 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Sen. White Moved Laid On Table; Senate Journal 13, Pg.478 | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/9/12; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Hearing: 4/24/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9, Pg.332 | |
2012-03-08 | House Ought to Pass (Rep B.Murphy): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 166-125; House Journal 23, PG.1390-1392 | |
2012-03-08 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Division Vote 140-142; House Journal 23, PG.1390 | |
2012-02-22 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 18, PG.1080 | |
2012-02-22 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1080 | |
2012-02-09 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-01-24 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 =Insurance Div= | |
2012-01-24 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/2/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-01-11 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/20/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 =Insurance Div= | |
2011-12-15 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/12/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 =Insurance Div= | |
2011-11-14 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.346 |