NH HB1183 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting the sale of agricultural land and land essential to critical industries to China.
Title
Relative to prohibiting the sale of agricultural land and land essential to critical industries to China.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-22 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/07/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/09/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |