NH HB1186 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1560s, 05/02/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1560s, 05/02/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to firearm purchaser's privacy.
Title
Relative to firearm purchaser's privacy.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Jonathan Stone [R] | Rep. Tom Mannion [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 174 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1560s, 05/02/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 47(f) 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0604h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-174 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0604h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0604h 02/12/2024 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |