NH HB1190 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to adopting the interstate social work licensure compact.
Title
Relative to adopting the interstate social work licensure compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - ITL (Y: 175 N: 200 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 175-200 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Lay HB1190 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 181-192 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-03-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 29 |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |