NH HB1193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to attorneys fees in child support cases.
Title
Relative to attorneys fees in child support cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Gay [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. John Plumer [R] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
Rep. Sue Mullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 2 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 13 |