NH HB1195 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to allowing school districts to approve different apportionment methods for school administrative unit costs.
Title
Relative to allowing school districts to approve different apportionment methods for school administrative unit costs.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meuse [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1125h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1125h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1125h 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 11 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/11/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2024 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education |