NH HB1199 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-190 04/11/2024 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-190 04/11/2024 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to services of the office of the child advocate for youth experiencing homelessness and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to services of the office of the child advocate for youth experiencing homelessness and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 192 N: 190 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - OTP (Y: 191 N: 192 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - ITL (Y: 190 N: 191 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - OTP (Y: 191 N: 192 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - ITL (Y: 190 N: 191 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-190 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | House | Lay HB1199 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Failed DV 189-193 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 191-192 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 190-191 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-03-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-03-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/26/2024 (Vote 13-12; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-21 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/06/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Finance 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12 |
2024-02-01 | House | Lay HB1199 on Table (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Failed DV 187-188 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12 |
2024-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/09/2024 02:30 pm 206-208 |
2024-01-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/09/2024 (Vote 12-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 12 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/09/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Children and Family Law |