NH HB120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of body art establishments and massage, reflexology, structural integrator and Asian bodywork therapy establishments.
Title
Relative to the regulation of body art establishments and massage, reflexology, structural integrator and Asian bodywork therapy establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 218 N: 155 NV: 7 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - OTP (Y: 255 N: 115 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - OTP (Y: 255 N: 115 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1034h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-155 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 20 |
2019-04-04 | House | Amendment # 2019-1034h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 20 |
2019-03-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1034h (NT) for 04/04/2019 (Vote 13-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-14 | House | Finance Division I Work Session: 03/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-03-07 | House | Finance Division I Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-02-05 | House | Finance-Division I Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Finance 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 21 |
2019-01-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 255-115 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 19 |
2019-01-31 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Yokela) 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 4 |
2019-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/17/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 38 |