NH HB1226 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting surveillance by the state on public ways or sidewalks.
Title
Prohibiting surveillance by the state on public ways or sidewalks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 267-18 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 131 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 61 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-15 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 14 |