NH HB1235 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to high school students serving as school board members.
Title
Relative to high school students serving as school board members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0646h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2024-0646h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0646h 02/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6 |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education |