NH HB1261 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0178; Effective date 7/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0178; Effective date 7/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the fee charged for delivery of notice of civil forfeiture of an unlicensed dog.
Title
Increasing the fee charged for delivery of notice of civil forfeiture of an unlicensed dog.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0178; Effective date 7/1/2014. |
2014-06-18 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1910c; Adopted, Div 207-102 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1910c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1910c; House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-23 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. James Belanger Replaces Rep. Coffey |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/23/2014; 11:00 Amendment; Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Boutin, Forrester, and Pierce |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-07 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Tatro, Coffey, Lavender, Bickford |
2014-05-07 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment and Requests C of C (Rep. Porter) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1323s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1323s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1323s, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/26/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 19 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/6/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government |