NH HB128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 76; Eff: 06/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study veterans property tax credits and exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study veterans property tax credits and exemptions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 76; Eff: 06/18/2019
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-03-27SenateHearing: 04/03/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0617h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 9
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0617h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 9
2019-03-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0617h (NT) for 03/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 5
2019-02-15House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-02-06House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 38

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback