NH HB1287 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the duration of antibiotic therapy for tick-borne illness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the duration of antibiotic therapy for tick-borne illness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0712h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 108
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0712h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 108
2020-03-03HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0712h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 37
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2020-02-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-23House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback