NH HB1295 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0097; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0097; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of livestock.
Title
Relative to the definition of livestock.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0097; Effective 8/10/2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1181s (Rep. Sad) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1181s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1181s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1181s, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/26/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0629h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0629h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0629h (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 2/11/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture |