NH HB1307 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1719s, 05/16/2024, Vote 6-0; Senate Calendar 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1719s, 05/16/2024, Vote 6-0; Senate Calendar 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a supplemental appropriation for members of the retirement system receiving an accidental disability retirement allowance.
Title
Providing a supplemental appropriation for members of the retirement system receiving an accidental disability retirement allowance.
Sponsors
Rep. Hope Damon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1719s, 05/16/2024, Vote 6-0; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 363-17 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/26/2024 (Vote 25-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 10 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-28 | House | Division Work Session: 03/06/2024 03:05 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0510h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0510h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0510h 02/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2024 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 |