NH HB1336 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 202-149 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 202-149 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disclosure of information regarding high school student assessment.
Title
Relative to disclosure of information regarding high school student assessment.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] |
Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 202-149 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 9 |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-02-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 29 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 18 |