NH HB1338 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/18/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/18/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to failure to renew a professional or occupational license.
Title
Relative to failure to renew a professional or occupational license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/18/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-09-19 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2012 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-09-19 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/20/2012 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-09-11 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2012 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-06-20 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/22/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-06-12 | House Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 6/15/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Executive Departments and Administration for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2433 | |
2012-03-08 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1440 | |
2012-02-13 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 18, PG.1094 | |
2012-02-13 | House Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Mar 7 (Vote 10-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1094 | |
2012-02-08 | House Executive Session: 2/13/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2012 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/9/2012 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-01-30 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2012 4:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-01-24 | House ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2012 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-01-24 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/25/2012 3:35 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-01-10 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2012 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-11-21 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 7, PG.352 |