NH HB1349 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study firearms incidents involving children with access to unsecured firearms.
Title
Establishing a committee to study firearms incidents involving children with access to unsecured firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meuse [D] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Rep. Cassandra Levesque [D] |
Rep. Mark Vallone [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - OTP (Y: 205 N: 128 NV: 22 Abs: 41) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 205-128 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 72 |
2020-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 33 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 19 |