NH HB1355 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire National Guard recruitment and reenlistment incentive program.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire National Guard recruitment and reenlistment incentive program.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/26/2024 (Vote 25-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 10 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-21 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/06/2024 01:50 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Finance 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12 |
2024-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/19/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 10 |
2024-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 1 |