NH HB1358 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:10 am; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:10 am; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to tenant and contract manufacturers of beer, wine, and liquor.
Title
Relative to tenant and contract manufacturers of beer, wine, and liquor.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:10 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1072h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1072h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1072h (NT) 03/20/2024 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 8 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 |