NH HB1362 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Title
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - Interim Study (Y: 227 N: 98 NV: 37 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302 |
2018-08-22 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building304 |
2018-03-06 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 227-98 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 117 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 49 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 8 |