NH HB1399 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing municipalities to permit 2 residential units in certain single-family residential zones.
Title
Allowing municipalities to permit 2 residential units in certain single-family residential zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 220 N: 140 NV: 11 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 20241157h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 220-140 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1157h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-03-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1157h 03/15/2024 (Vote 9-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 37 |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Special Committee on Housing House Journal 1 |