NH HB1407 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - ==ROOM CHANGE== Hearing: 04/03/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 13A
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - ==ROOM CHANGE== Hearing: 04/03/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 13A
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to child care staffing ratios.
Title
Relative to child care staffing ratios.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | ==ROOM CHANGE== Hearing: 04/03/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 13A |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0753h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2024-0753h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0753h 02/21/2024 (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Special Committee on Childcare House Journal 1 |