NH HB1408 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to license plate covers.
Title
Relative to license plate covers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0619h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment # 2020-0619h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 36 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0619h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 37 |
2020-02-05 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 21 |