NH HB1415 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 171; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 171; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to escape from official custody.
Title
Relative to escape from official custody.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. Paul Henle [D] | Rep. Deborah Wheeler [D] |
Rep. Dianne Schuett [D] | Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. James MacKay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 171; Eff. 1/1/2017 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1795s (Rep. Tholl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 3 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1795s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1795s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016 Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1795s, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2016, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 11 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 13 |