NH HB1418 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of education freedom account funds to purchase school uniforms.
Title
Relative to the use of education freedom account funds to purchase school uniforms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/15/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 |