NH HB1444 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0181; Effective date 9/9/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0181; Effective date 9/9/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the month of April as Genocide Awareness Month.
Title
Recognizing the month of April as Genocide Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0181; Effective date 9/9/2014. |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1782eba Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment 1782e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 4/24/14, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 2/13/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |