NH HB1451 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0127; Effective 8/15/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0127; Effective 8/15/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a canine veterans day.
Title
Establishing a canine veterans day.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Maureen Mann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0127; Effective 8/15/2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 4/24/14, Room 100, State House, 2:05 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs |
2014-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0941h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0941h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 3/4/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-02-13 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Executive Session: 3/06/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/20/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |