NH HB1453 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0103; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0103; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to procedures of the board of podiatry.
Title
Relative to procedures of the board of podiatry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0103; Effective 8/10/2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1303s (Rep. Weber) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1303s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1303s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1303s, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/9/14, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2014-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |