NH HB1521 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing voters to vote for multiple candidates for an office.
Title
Allowing voters to vote for multiple candidates for an office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 22 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building308 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 17 |