NH HB1521 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 10:30 am in Room 103, Legislative Office Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 10:30 am in Room 103, Legislative Office Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to recovery houses.
Title
Relative to recovery houses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0902h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-0902h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0902h (NT) 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 16 |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/14/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 |