NH HB153 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0218; Effective Date 7/14/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0218; Effective Date 7/14/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the growth and sale of industrial hemp in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the growth and sale of industrial hemp in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0218; Effective Date 7/14/2014. |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1817eba Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment 1817e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #0050hs (Rep. Pantelakos) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0050s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0050s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0050s, New Title, 1/30/14; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 4/11/13, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.772 |
2013-03-06 | House | Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703 |
2013-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought To Pass for Mar 13 (Vote 17-2; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.514 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 11:00 Amendment)== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.184 |